IA HF2417 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to allowable forms for payment for amusement concessions at a fair. (Formerly HSB 658.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to allowable forms for payment for amusement concessions at a fair. (Formerly HSB 658.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 631. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 616. |
2018-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 406. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 456. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 453. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2332. S.J. 453. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2332. S.J. 449. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 449. |
2018-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 392. |
2018-02-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 429. |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 388. |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 298. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB658 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.