IA HF2397 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a newly constructed baseball and softball park project.(See HF 2582.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a newly constructed baseball and softball park project.(See HF 2582.)
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Mohr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 811. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2582. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 751. |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2022 8:15AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Kaufmann and Kurth. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 264. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2582 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2397 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2397.html |