IA HF2392 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mortgage administration and mortgage servicers. (Formerly HSB 609.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mortgage administration and mortgage servicers. (Formerly HSB 609.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 629. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 595. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 595. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2298. S.J. 594. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2298. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 360. |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 346. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 224. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3111 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2298.
HSB609 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2392.
SF2298 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 595.
HSB609 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2392.
SF2298 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 595.