IA HF2388 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuity of learning for children adjudicated under the juvenile justice law or receiving foster care services. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuity of learning for children adjudicated under the juvenile justice law or receiving foster care services. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 719. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 680. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 680. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 697. |
2014-04-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 638. |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 638. |
2014-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8127. H.J. 637. |
2014-03-18 | House | Senate amendment H-8127 filed. H.J. 535. |
2014-03-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 505. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 572. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 571. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5071 filed, adopted. S.J. 571. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 543. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hart, Boettger, and Bowman. S.J. 523. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 491. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 491. |
2014-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 436. |
2014-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 468. |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 431. |
2014-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8075 adopted. H.J. 431. |
2014-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8075 filed. H.J. 419. |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 307. |