IA HF2382 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the composition of the engineering and land surveying examining board. (Formerly HSB 669.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the composition of the engineering and land surveying examining board. (Formerly HSB 669.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 753. |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 733. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 733. |
2018-03-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 681. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 791. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 787. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 786. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 712. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Carlin, Brown, and Dvorsky. S.J. 600. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Brown, and Danielson. S.J. 592. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 550. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 550. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 487. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays none. H.J. 482. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 280. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB669 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2018 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled)