IA HF2374 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating individual income tax credits for military service during certain military conflicts in Lebanon, Grenada, and Panama, and for service during certain military conflicts in the Persian Gulf, providing for penalties, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 650)
Title
A bill for an act creating individual income tax credits for military service during certain military conflicts in Lebanon, Grenada, and Panama, and for service during certain military conflicts in the Persian Gulf, providing for penalties, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 650)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-11 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Landon, and Muhlbauer. H.J. 378. |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 305. |