IA HF234 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Committee amendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 144.
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Committee amendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 144.
Summary
A bill for an act requiring health insurance coverage for costs relating to mental health conditions, including alcohol or substance abuse treatment services. (Formerly HF 139) (Formerly HSB 6)
Title
A bill for an act requiring health insurance coverage for costs relating to mental health conditions, including alcohol or substance abuse treatment services. (Formerly HF 139) (Formerly HSB 6)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Committee amendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 144. | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 144. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-25 | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 2127. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendment H-1590 filed. H.J. 1451. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment H-1533 filed. H.J. 1392. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 1357. | |
2009-03-24 | Amendments H-1290 and H-1292 filed. H.J. 1029. | |
2009-03-18 | Amendments H-1213, H-1214, H-1215, H-1216, and H-1221 filed. H.J. 889. | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment H-1178 filed. H.J. 850. | |
2009-02-27 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 289. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0253C&ga=83 |