IA HF2322 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Amendment H-8323 filed. H.J. 806.
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Amendment H-8323 filed. H.J. 806.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa finance authority by modifying certain duties and programs of the authority and establishing a workforce housing assistance grant fund administered by the authority. (Formerly HSB 666)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa finance authority by modifying certain duties and programs of the authority and establishing a workforce housing assistance grant fund administered by the authority. (Formerly HSB 666)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Amendment H-8323 filed. H.J. 806. | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment H-8250 filed. H.J. 716. | |
2010-02-24 | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 697. | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment H-8091 lost. H.J. 697. | |
2010-02-23 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2010-02-10 | Amendment H-8091 filed. H.J. 327. | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 281. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1253C&ga=83 |