IA HF2310 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1562.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1562.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to raising or releasing pen-reared pheasants originating from a hatchery approved by the department of natural resources. Effective 7-01-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to raising or releasing pen-reared pheasants originating from a hatchery approved by the department of natural resources. Effective 7-01-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1562. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1559. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1559. | |
2010-03-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1165. | |
2010-03-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 947. | |
2010-03-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 20. S.J. 946. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 806. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 635. | |
2010-02-24 | Subcommittee, Fraise, Hahn, and Ragan. S.J. 561. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. S.J. 472. | |
2010-02-18 | Message from House. S.J. 472. | |
2010-02-18 | Immediate message. H.J. 612. | |
2010-02-18 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 606. | |
2010-02-12 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 490. | |
2010-02-08 | Subcommittee, Beard, Baudler, and Palmer. H.J. 288. | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 274. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1241C&ga=83 |