IA HF2304 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting quotas for traffic stops by peace officers.(Formerly HF 2010.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting quotas for traffic stops by peace officers.(Formerly HF 2010.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 4:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and Klimesh. S.J. 441. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 404. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 404. |
2024-02-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 427. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-29 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 482. |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 415. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 191. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2010 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 428.