IA HF2304 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles approaching certain stationary motor vehicles, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 509.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles approaching certain stationary motor vehicles, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 509.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 752. |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 733. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 733. |
2018-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 703. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 804. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0. S.J. 803. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 672. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Danielson, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 599. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 567. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 532. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 532. |
2018-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 459. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays none. H.J. 450. |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB509 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.