IA HF2288 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reporting and other requirements concerning the department of administrative services and other state agencies. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reporting and other requirements concerning the department of administrative services and other state agencies. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 602. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 565. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565. |
2014-03-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 507. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 607. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 2. S.J. 606. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 558. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 508. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 508. |
2014-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 454. |
2014-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 468. |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 451. |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 258. |