IA HF2286 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act appropriating certain tax receipts concerning internet fantasy sports contests and sports wagering to the county endowment fund.(Formerly HSB 614; See HF 2548, HF 2566.)
Title
A bill for an act appropriating certain tax receipts concerning internet fantasy sports contests and sports wagering to the county endowment fund.(Formerly HSB 614; See HF 2548, HF 2566.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 689. |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2548. |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 440. |
2022-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2022 8:30AM RM 19. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Gjerde and Hein. H.J. 208. |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB614 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
HF2548 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 646.
HF2548 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 646.