IA HF2280 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Amendment S-5222 filed. S.J. 889.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Amendment S-5222 filed. S.J. 889.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to subject and performance-based assessments administered prior to a student’s completion of a practitioner preparation program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2007.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to subject and performance-based assessments administered prior to a student’s completion of a practitioner preparation program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2007.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5222 filed. S.J. 889. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 871. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Amendments S-5211 and S-5214 filed. S.J. 860. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 678. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Bowman, and Rozenboom. S.J. 592. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 545. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 545. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 473. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 55 nays 42. H.J. 473. |
2018-03-06 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 472. |
2018-03-06 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 472. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8169 adopted. H.J. 472. |
2018-03-06 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 472. |
2018-03-06 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 471. |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 471. |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8169. H.J. 470. |
2018-03-06 | House | Point of order raised on H-8169, ruled not germane. H.J. 470. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8085 lost. H.J. 470. |
2018-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8169 filed. H.J. 461. |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment H-8085 filed. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2007 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 473.