IA HF2259 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to human trafficking prevention training and reporting for employees of lodging providers in the state. Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to human trafficking prevention training and reporting for employees of lodging providers in the state. Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 685.
2020-06-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 746.
2020-06-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 742.
2020-06-10SenateAmendment S-5115 withdrawn. S.J. 742.
2020-06-09SenateAmendment S-5115 filed. S.J. 719.
2020-06-09SenateCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 719.
2020-03-10SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, R. Smith, and T. Taylor. S.J. 563.
2020-03-09SenateRead first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 541.
2020-03-09SenateMessage from House. S.J. 541.
2020-03-05HouseImmediate message. H.J. 513.
2020-03-10HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 566.
2020-03-10HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 565.
2020-03-05HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 508.
2020-03-05HouseAmendment H-8046 withdrawn. H.J. 507.
2020-02-28HouseFiscal note.
2020-02-27HouseAmendment H-8046 filed. H.J. 407.
2020-02-20HousePlaced on calendar H.J. 323.
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 323.
2020-02-13HouseSponsor added, Isenhart. H.J. 271.
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 7:45AM House Lounge.
2020-02-11HouseSubcommittee: Mohr, G., Breckenridge and Thorup. H.J. 251.
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 203.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback