IA HF2228 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for a motor vehicle operator to have control of the vehicle at all times and to change lanes or reduce speed in specific situations, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for a motor vehicle operator to have control of the vehicle at all times and to change lanes or reduce speed in specific situations, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 809. | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 770. | |
2012-04-09 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 770. | |
2012-03-29 | Message from House. S.J. 690. | |
2012-03-28 | Immediate message. H.J. 692. | |
2012-03-28 | Passed House, ayes 92, nays none. H.J. 687. | |
2012-03-28 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8325. H.J. 686. | |
2012-03-22 | Senate amendment H-8325 filed. H.J. 639. | |
2012-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 633. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 635. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 634. | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment S-5120 filed, adopted. S.J. 633. | |
2012-03-14 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 566. | |
2012-03-14 | Subcommittee, Hancock, Beall, et al. S.J. 561. | |
2012-03-13 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 521. | |
2012-03-13 | Message from House. S.J. 521. | |
2012-03-12 | Immediate message. H.J. 506. | |
2012-03-12 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 500. | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 208. |