IA HF2216 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the definition of off-road utility vehicle for purposes of regulation by the department of natural resources. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the definition of off-road utility vehicle for purposes of regulation by the department of natural resources. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 468. |
2014-03-04 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 416. |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 416. |
2014-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 308. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 317. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 313. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2128. S.J. 313. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion Senate File 2128. S.J. 290. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 290. |
2014-02-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 267. |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 266. |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 223. |