IA HF2191 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the commutation of sentence procedure for class "A" felons.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the commutation of sentence procedure for class "A" felons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 11:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Fisher and Kressig. H.J. 199. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 155. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2191 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2191.html |