IA HF2183 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle insurance, including requiring owners of registered motor vehicles to maintain financial liability coverage, establishing a motor vehicle insurance verification database, authorizing the use of automated registration plate reader systems, and authorizing county enforcement and diversion programs, establishing fees, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle insurance, including requiring owners of registered motor vehicles to maintain financial liability coverage, establishing a motor vehicle insurance verification database, authorizing the use of automated registration plate reader systems, and authorizing county enforcement and diversion programs, establishing fees, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 11:30AM House Lounge.
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee: Thorup, Carlson and Judge. H.J. 189.
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 157.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback