IA HF2171 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation. (See HF 2488, HF 2600.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation. (See HF 2488, HF 2600.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 532. |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 309. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Bergan and Ehlert. H.J. 163. |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2488 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 532.
HF2600 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
HF2600 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2171 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2171.html |