IA HF217 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 678.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disciplinary actions taken against a licensed school employee required to be reported to the board of educational examiners. (Formerly HSB 17.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to disciplinary actions taken against a licensed school employee required to be reported to the board of educational examiners. (Formerly HSB 17.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 678. |
2017-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 520. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 501. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 501. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 497. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Substituted for SF 239. S.J. 497. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 239. S.J. 389. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 389. |
2017-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 451. |
2017-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 504. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 5. H.J. 436. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB17 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178.
SSB1017 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2017 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SF239 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 502.
SSB1017 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2017 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SF239 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 502.