IA HF216 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to paternity in certain actions before the juvenile court. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to paternity in certain actions before the juvenile court. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039. |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038. |
2023-05-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 975. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1024. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1019. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for SF 147. S.J. 1019. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 147. S.J. 347. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 347. |
2023-02-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 322. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 251. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1003 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 147.
HSB5 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 216.
SF147 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1020.
HSB5 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 216.
SF147 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1020.