IA HF2155 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2395.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2395.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the compassion and care for medically challenging pregnancies Act.(See HF 2395.)
Title
A bill for an act creating the compassion and care for medically challenging pregnancies Act.(See HF 2395.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2395. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 207. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Andrews, Matson and Wilz, H. H.J. 153. |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 140. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2395 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 225.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2155 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2155.html |