IA HF215 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and providing for education reform involving student, teacher, and administrator programs and activities under the purview of the department of education, the state board of education, the college student aid commission, school districts, and accredited nonpublic schools; providing for independent private instruction for students; providing for private instruction for students; concerning driver education by a teaching parent; making appropriations and providing for the establishment and retention of certain fees; and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 4) Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and providing for education reform involving student, teacher, and administrator programs and activities under the purview of the department of education, the state board of education, the college student aid commission, school districts, and accredited nonpublic schools; providing for independent private instruction for students; providing for private instruction for students; concerning driver education by a teaching parent; making appropriations and providing for the establishment and retention of certain fees; and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 4) Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1114. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1113. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1113. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1089. |
2013-05-22 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1041. |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 40, nays 10. S.J. 1040. |
2013-05-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1040. |
2013-05-22 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1039. |
2013-05-22 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1038. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 1089. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1113. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1111. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1095. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 1088. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1088. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1087. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 734. |
2013-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 756. |
2013-04-04 | House | House conference committee appointed Jorgensen, Dolecheck, Stanerson, Steckman, and Wood. H.J. 755. |
2013-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 755. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Quirmbach, Chair; Bowman, Ernst, Sinclair, and Wilhelm. S.J. 733. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 733. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 732. |
2013-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 755. |
2013-04-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 812. |
2013-04-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 760. |
2013-04-04 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1248. H.J. 754. |
2013-04-04 | House | Senate amendment H-1248. H.J. 753. |
2013-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 752. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 727. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 727. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3106 adopted. S.J. 727. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3118 filed, adopted. S.J. 726. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3116, ruled out of order. S.J. 726. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3116 filed. S.J. 726. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3106 filed. S.J. 715. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 715. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Ernst, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 322. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 300. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 300. |
2013-02-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 334. |
2013-02-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 352. |
2013-02-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 335. |
2013-02-19 | House | Chief Clerk's report on correction in engrossment. H.J. 334. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 52, nays 44. H.J. 332. |
2013-02-19 | House | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 331. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1038 withdrawn. H.J. 331. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1034 withdrawn. H.J. 330. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 330. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1026. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1026. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1026 not germane. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1041 withdrawn. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1028 lost. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendments H-1036, H-1037, and H-1042 withdrawn. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1031 lost. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1027 out of order. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1035 withdrawn. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1040 lost. H.J. 329. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 328. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1032. H.J. 328. |
2013-02-19 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1032. H.J. 327. |
2013-02-19 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1032 not germane. H.J. 327. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendments H-1044 and H-1030 lost. H.J. 327. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1029 lost. H.J. 326. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1033 as amended, lost. H.J. 326. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1050 to amendment H-1033 filed, adopted. H.J. 325. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1045 lost. H.J. 325. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 324. |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1039. H.J. 323. |
2013-02-19 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1039. H.J. 323. |
2013-02-19 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1039 not germane. H.J. 323. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendments H-1019, H-1021, and H-1022 adopted. H.J. 322. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1018 withdrawn. H.J. 322. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1017 lost. H.J. 322. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1016 as amended, adopted. H.J. 321. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1049 to amendment H-1016 filed, adopted. H.J. 321. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1020B adopted. H.J. 321. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1020A withdrawn. H.J. 320. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1025 withdrawn. H.J. 320. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1024 lost. H.J. 320. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1023 withdrawn. H.J. 319. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1015 adopted. H.J. 318. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1043 as amended, adopted. H.J. 318. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1052 to amendment H-1043 filed, adopted. H.J. 318. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1051 to amendment H-1043 filed, adopted. H.J. 318. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1014 adopted. H.J. 318. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1047 to amendment H-1014 lost. H.J. 317. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1047 to amendment H-1014 filed. H.J. 316. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1048 to amendment H-1014 lost. H.J. 316. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1048 to amendment H-1014 filed. H.J. 315. |
2013-02-19 | House | Fiscal note to amendment H-1014. HCS. |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendments H-1041, H-1042, H-1043, H-1044, and H-1045 filed. H.J. 307. |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendments H-1032, H-1033, H-1034, H-1035, H-1036, H-1037, H-1038, H-1039, and H-1040 filed. H.J. 307. |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendments H-1023, H-1024, H-1025, H-1026, H-1027, H-1028, H-1029, H-1030, and H-1031 filed. H.J. 307. |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendments H-1014, H-1015, H-1016, H-1017, H-1018, H-1019, H-1020, H-1021, and H-1022 filed. H.J. 307. |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 294. |
2013-02-14 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 295. |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 295. |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 287. |