IA HF2119 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confinement feeding operations maintaining fishes, by providing for the calculation of animal unit capacity, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (See HF 2281.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confinement feeding operations maintaining fishes, by providing for the calculation of animal unit capacity, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (See HF 2281.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 307. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, P. Miller and Paustian. H.J. 163. |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 158. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2281 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2119 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2119.html |