IA HF2109 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to vapor products and alternative nicotine products, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to vapor products and alternative nicotine products, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 896. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 883. |
2014-04-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 842. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed House, ayes 74, nays 23. H.J. 838. |
2014-04-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8327. H.J. 838. |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment H-8332 to Senate amendment H-8327 filed, lost. H.J. 838. |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment H-8331 to Senate amendment H-8327 lost. H.J. 838. |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment H-8331 to Senate amendment H-8327 filed. H.J. 837. |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate amendment H-8327 filed. H.J. 833. |
2014-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 828. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 874. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 37, nays 12. S.J. 874. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-5088 adopted. S.J. 874. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-5190 filed, lost. S.J. 873. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amendments S-5061 and S-5174 withdrawn. S.J. 873. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5174 filed. S.J. 842. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5088 filed. S.J. 639. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 619. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5061 filed. S.J. 555. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 555. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 247. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 238. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 238. |
2014-02-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 214. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 76, nays 22. H.J. 213. |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 212. |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8008. H.J. 212. |
2014-02-11 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8008. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8008 not germane. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8006 as amended, adopted. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8011 to amendment H-8006 adopted. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8011 to amendment H-8006 filed. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Amendment H-8009 lost. H.J. 211. |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 210. |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8007. H.J. 209. |
2014-02-11 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8007. H.J. 209. |
2014-02-11 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8007 not germane. H.J. 209. |
2014-02-10 | House | Amendment H-8009 filed. H.J. 199. |
2014-02-10 | House | Amendments H-8006, H-8007, and H-8008 filed. H.J. 198. |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 141. |