IA HF2097 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to forfeiture of bail. (Formerly HSB 535.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to forfeiture of bail. (Formerly HSB 535.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 868. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 868. |
2022-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 779. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 704. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 703. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 485. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Rowley, Bisignano, and J. Taylor. S.J. 370. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 358. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 358. |
2022-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 319. |
2022-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, 0 nays. H.J. 309. |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 123. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB535 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2097.