IA HF2072 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to administrators employed by school districts, including requiring administrators to provide instruction to students and modifying the responsibilities of the board of educational examiners.
Title
A bill for an act relating to administrators employed by school districts, including requiring administrators to provide instruction to students and modifying the responsibilities of the board of educational examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Collins, Kurth and Moore, T. H.J. 122. |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 99. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2072 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2072.html |