IA HF2065 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of the Iowa violent death reporting system.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of the Iowa violent death reporting system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Anderson and Boden. H.J. 257. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 102. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2065 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2065.html |