IA HF2057 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to taking fur-bearing animals without prior permission of the natural resource commission.(See HF 2369.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to taking fur-bearing animals without prior permission of the natural resource commission.(See HF 2369.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 542. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2369. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 213. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Baxter and Hall. H.J. 105. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 101. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2369 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Senate amendment H-8304 filed. H.J. 752.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2057 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2057.html |