IA HF2050 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reports of false information regarding an alleged act of child abuse, family assessments, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reports of false information regarding an alleged act of child abuse, family assessments, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Wheeler and Wilburn. H.J. 103. |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 92. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2050 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2050.html |