IA HF2038 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to initial appearance minimum bond amounts for certain criminal offenses.(See HF 2555.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to initial appearance minimum bond amounts for certain criminal offenses.(See HF 2555.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2555. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 272. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee: Vondran, Gustoff and Meyer, B. H.J. 94. |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 75. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2555 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 280.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2038 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2038.html |