IA HF2037 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school districts that share an operational function in the area of superintendent management and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2080.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to school districts that share an operational function in the area of superintendent management and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2080.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 320. |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2080. |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 106. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Gjerde and Thompson. H.J. 88. |
2022-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 84. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2080 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2037 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2037.html |