IA HF2032 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the use of lighted headlamps on motor vehicles at all times of operation, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the use of lighted headlamps on motor vehicles at all times of operation, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 2:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Isenhart and Maxwell. H.J. 123. |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 93. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2032 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2032.html |