IA HF164 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of the value of child restraint systems in the partial loss calculation for specified insurance settlements of first-party automobile partial losses and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of the value of child restraint systems in the partial loss calculation for specified insurance settlements of first-party automobile partial losses and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Cisneros and Judge. H.J. 320. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 182. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF164 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF164.html |