IA HF153 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - Subcommittee reassigned, Heaton, Iverson, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 71.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - Subcommittee reassigned, Heaton, Iverson, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 71.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the protection of life beginning at conception, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the protection of life beginning at conception, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | Subcommittee reassigned, Heaton, Iverson, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 71. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-01 | Subcommittee, Heaton, Pearson, and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 204. | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 192. |