IA HF147 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized methods of take for a resident hunting deer using a license issued to a nonambulatory person.(See HF 551.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized methods of take for a resident hunting deer using a license issued to a nonambulatory person.(See HF 551.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 551. |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 397. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2021 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Fisher, Baxter and Brown-Powers. H.J. 265. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 136. |
Same As/Similar To
HF551 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Senate amendment H-1498 filed. H.J. 1140.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF147 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF147.html |