IA HF124 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to expenses incurred in relation to certain legal matters concerning a child under the jurisdiction of the juvenile court.
Title
A bill for an act relating to expenses incurred in relation to certain legal matters concerning a child under the jurisdiction of the juvenile court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 8:00AM RM 19. |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Dunwell and Wilburn. H.J. 302. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 193. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF124 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF124.html |