IA HF115 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring an assessor to comply with certain local policies.(See HF 279.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring an assessor to comply with certain local policies.(See HF 279.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Dunwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 407. |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 279. |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 296. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 1:00PM RM 19. |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Rinker and Staed. H.J. 200. |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 183. |
Same As/Similar To
HF279 (Similar To) 2023-04-06 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF115 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF115.html |