IA HF112 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the forfeiture of bail in a criminal case. (Formerly HSB 25) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the forfeiture of bail in a criminal case. (Formerly HSB 25) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 943. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 781. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 759. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 758. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 688. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee, Horn, Taylor, and Zaun. S.J. 238. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 204. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 204. |
2013-02-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 239. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 238. |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 139. |