HI SR99 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Begin Discussions And Plans To Establish Public-private Partnerships To Build Prisons, Re-entry Centers, Drug Treatment Facilities, Or Other Correctional Facilities In The State To Deal With The State's Prison Overcrowding And To Return The Majority Of Our Prisoners Who Are Incarcerated On The Mainland.
Title
Public-Private Partnerships to Build Prisons and Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-11 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |