HI SR96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR96
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor, The Department Of Agriculture, The University Of Hawaii College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources, And Other Related Entities To Take Action To Help Expand The Aquaculture Industry In The State.
Title
Urging The Governor, The Department Of Agriculture, The University Of Hawaii College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources, And Other Related Entities To Take Action To Help Expand The Aquaculture Industry In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR96 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR116 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR116 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=96&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR96_.HTM |