HI SR92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR92
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.
Title
Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR92 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=92&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR92_.HTM |