HI SR80 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Development Of Proposed Legislation Mandating The Size And Extent Of A Managed Care Plan's Specialty Network.
Title
Managed Care; California
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3114), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPN. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee on HMS will reconsider its previous decision on SR80 and will hold a public decision making on 04-08-10 2:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-29-10 1:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-10 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR179 (Same As) 2010-04-20 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.