HI SR79 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Research And Convene Stakeholder Discussions To Consider The Concept Of A Wildfire Insurance Compact.
Title
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Research And Convene Stakeholder Discussions To Consider The Concept Of A Wildfire Insurance Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3550) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR57 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR93 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 27
SCR93 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 27