HI SR76 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Form A Working Group To Examine Smarter Sentencing To Improve The Quality And Reliability Of State Criminal Sentencing Practices.
Title
Public Safety; Smarter Sentencing Working Group; Establishment (SD1)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |