HI SR75 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety And The Hawaii Paroling Authority To Identify Up To Five Hundred Non-violent Inmates Who Could Be Involved In A Day Reporting Center, Be Monitored Via Twenty-four Hour/seven Days A Week Gps Electronic Monitoring, Be Included In An Extended Work Furlough Program, And/or Be Eligible For An Early Release Program.
Title
DPS; Day Reporting; Monitoring
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3110) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-10 1:40PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Re-Referred to PSM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR172 (Same As) 2010-04-22 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.