HI SR65 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR65
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Work With Housing Stakeholders And Other State And County Agencies To Evaluate And Update The Rental Housing Revolving Fund Program's Policies And Procedures And Reinstate The Predevelopment Loan Program.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Work With Housing Stakeholders And Other State And County Agencies To Evaluate And Update The Rental Housing Revolving Fund Program's Policies And Procedures And Reinstate The Predevelopment Loan Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR65 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=65&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR65_.HTM |