HI SR59 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Working Group To Discuss Mixed Use Development In The Urban Core And Main Streets, Ways Of Constructing Density In The Urban Core To Minimize Sprawl, And Mixed Use Development Regarding Transit Stations.
Title
Urban Core and Main Street Redevelopment Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fukunaga; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Re-Referred to WLH. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |