HI SR53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The Hawaii Psychological Association To Develop Draft Legislation Establishing, Implementing, And Monitoring Continuing Education Requirements For All Licensed Psychologists In Hawaii.
Title
Licensed Psychologists; Continuing Education; Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs (SD1)
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-13. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1111) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=53&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR53_.HTM |